Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Approved by Governor (G)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
House Message (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by House Speaker (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Constitutional Objection Filed (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Emergency Clause Defeated on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 106 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 106 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
House Adopts (H) - SS#2 AYES: 106 NOES: 49 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Bill Reconsidered (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Reported to the House with... (H) - SS#2
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 23 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 23 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
SS#2 Adopted (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
SS#2 Offered (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
SS Withdrawn (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
SS Offered
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 13, 2024, 10:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Second read and referred: Health and Welfare(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read First Time (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Delivered to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 102 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 49 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Re-referred to Committee: General Laws(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred: Budget(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|