LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2634
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri House Bill HB2634
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2024 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB2634
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 29, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 10, 2024
Fiscal Note
February 28, 2024
Fiscal Note
February 22, 2024
Fiscal Note
February 12, 2024
Bill
February 5, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 28, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 25, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
April 29, 2024
Analysis
February 28, 2024
Analysis
February 22, 2024
Bill
February 21, 2024
Compare
Analysis
February 8, 2024
Substitute
Bill
April 10, 2024
Compare