LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2668
Action History
MO
Missouri House Bill HB2668
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2024 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB2668
Action History
House
04/25/2024
Public Hearing Completed (H)
House
04/18/2024
Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
House
02/22/2024
Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
House
02/12/2024
Read Second Time (H)
House
02/08/2024
Introduced and Read First Time (H)