House | 05/16/2024 | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Public Policy(H) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |