House | 05/01/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Referred: Local Government(H) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |