Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2936 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 11, 2024
Fiscal Note April 2, 2024
Bill March 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 12, 2024
Bill April 11, 2024
Analysis March 8, 2024