House | 05/07/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Innovation and Technology(H) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |