Senate | 04/22/2024 | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 102 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 3 | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 01/02/2024 | Prefiled (H) |