Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HJR104 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 9, 2024
Fiscal Note February 19, 2024
Bill January 2, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 10, 2024
Analysis March 19, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024