Senate
|
07/11/2024
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
S concurs in HCS, as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
HA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted --(5286H07.13H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
HA 2 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Peters)--(5286H07.22H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
HA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sassmann)--(5286H07.21H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
HA 6 to HCS H offered (Owen)--(5286H07.13H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Owen)--(5286H07.17H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Perkins)--(5286H07.08H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (O'Donnell)--(5286H07.10H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davidson)--(5286H07.04H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Christofanelli)--(5286H07.16H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred H Insurance Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Updated Fiscal Note removes requirement for Fiscal Oversight Review - Bill returned from committee on Fiscal Oversight
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
SS S offered & adopted (Trent)--(5286S.03F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
S First Read
|
|
|