Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri Senate Bill SB1359 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 7, 2024
Fiscal Note April 29, 2024
Fiscal Note April 2, 2024
Fiscal Note March 28, 2024
Fiscal Note February 23, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2024