House
|
07/08/2024
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Bill Placed on H Informal Calendar SBs for Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Hearing Conducted H Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Referred H Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
SA 1 S offered & defeated (Schroer)--(5414S02.08S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
S First Read
|
|
|