LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1388
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri Senate Bill SB1388
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2024 Regular Session
Missouri Senate Bill SB1388
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 30, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 24, 2024
Fiscal Note
March 1, 2024
Bill
February 7, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 24, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 20, 2024
Compare