House
|
07/09/2024
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Bill Placed on H Informal Calendar SBs for Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
SS#2 S offered & adopted (Eslinger)--(3392S.10F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
SS S withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
SA 1 to SS S offered (Eslinger)--(3392S04.12S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
SS S offered (Eslinger)--(3392S.04F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Hearing Cancelled S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2023
|
Prefiled
|
|
|