Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri Senate Bill SB872 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 4, 2024
Fiscal Note March 28, 2024
Fiscal Note January 24, 2024
Bill December 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2024