House
|
05/30/2024
|
Delivered to Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Hearing Conducted H Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Referred H Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Black)--(4005S.03F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Reported from S General Laws Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (4005S.02C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2023
|
Prefiled
|
|
|