House | 04/28/2025 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Referred: Rules - Legislative(H) | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues(H) | ||
House | 01/09/2025 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/08/2025 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/02/2024 | Prefiled (H) |