Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 22, 2025, 2:00 p.m., Senate Lounge - 3rd Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Second read and referred: Local Government, Elections and Pensions(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Third Read and Passed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 2, HA 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Referred: Elections(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2025
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2025
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|