Missouri 2025 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB661 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 27, 2025
Fiscal Note February 25, 2025
Fiscal Note February 10, 2025
Bill December 23, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 26, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2025
Analysis February 24, 2025
Bill February 19, 2025
Analysis January 21, 2025