House | 04/02/2025 | Third Read and Defeated (H) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | HCS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred: Rules - Legislative(H) | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Referred: Transportation(H) | ||
House | 01/09/2025 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/08/2025 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/23/2024 | Prefiled (H) |