House | 04/23/2025 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Referred: Rules - Legislative(H) | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) | ||
House | 01/09/2025 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/08/2025 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/23/2024 | Prefiled (H) |