Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 23, 2025, 11:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2 - 1st Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Third Read and Passed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4 adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2025
|
Referred: Financial Institutions(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2025
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2025
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/30/2024
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|