House | 04/15/2025 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Referred: Rules - Administrative(H) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Referred: Legislative Review(H) | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Referred: Children and Families(H) | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |