1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | FIRST REGULAR SESSION |
---|
3 | 3 | | SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION NO. 7 |
---|
4 | 4 | | 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
5 | 5 | | INTRODUCED BY SENATOR BRATTIN. |
---|
6 | 6 | | 1416S.01I KRISTINA MARTIN, Secretary |
---|
7 | 7 | | JOINT RESOLUTION |
---|
8 | 8 | | Submitting to the qualified voters of Missouri, an amendment repealing section 26 of article X of |
---|
9 | 9 | | the Constitution of Missouri, and adopting two new sections in lieu thereof relating to |
---|
10 | 10 | | the taxation of real property. |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | Be it resolved by the Senate, the House of Representatives concurring therein: |
---|
13 | 13 | | That at the next general election to be held in the 1 |
---|
14 | 14 | | state of Missouri, on Tuesday next following the first Monday 2 |
---|
15 | 15 | | in November, 2026, or at a special election to be called by 3 |
---|
16 | 16 | | the governor for that purpose, there is hereby submitted to 4 |
---|
17 | 17 | | the qualified voters of this state, for adoption or 5 |
---|
18 | 18 | | rejection, the following amendment to article X of the 6 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Constitution of the state of Missouri:7 |
---|
20 | 20 | | Section A. Section 26, article X, Consti tution of 1 |
---|
21 | 21 | | Missouri, is repealed and two new sections adopted in lieu 2 |
---|
22 | 22 | | thereof, to be known as sections 4(e) and 26, to read as 3 |
---|
23 | 23 | | follows:4 |
---|
24 | 24 | | Section 4(e). 1. Notwithstanding any provision of 1 |
---|
25 | 25 | | this article to the contrary, for all years beginning on or 2 |
---|
26 | 26 | | after January 1, 2027, no county or political subdivision 3 |
---|
27 | 27 | | shall be authorized to levy or collect a tax on property in 4 |
---|
28 | 28 | | class 1. 5 |
---|
29 | 29 | | 2. In lieu of an ad valorem tax on property in class 6 |
---|
30 | 30 | | 1, beginning January 1, 2027, a county shall impose a sales 7 |
---|
31 | 31 | | tax on the sale of property in class 1 at a rate equal to 8 |
---|
32 | 32 | | the total combined rate of sales taxes in effect at the 9 SJR 7 2 |
---|
33 | 33 | | location of the property, including the state sales tax 10 |
---|
34 | 34 | | rate, provided that all revenue generated by such tax shall 11 |
---|
35 | 35 | | be collected and distributed by the county in the same 12 |
---|
36 | 36 | | manner as the ad valorem property tax levied prior to 13 |
---|
37 | 37 | | January 1, 2027. A taxpayer shall select one of the 14 |
---|
38 | 38 | | following methods to remit the tax imposed by this 15 |
---|
39 | 39 | | subsection: 16 |
---|
40 | 40 | | (1) The taxpayer shall remit all tax due to the co unty 17 |
---|
41 | 41 | | collector upon the transfer of title of the property; 18 |
---|
42 | 42 | | (2) The taxpayer shall remit ten percent of the sales 19 |
---|
43 | 43 | | tax due to the county collector upon the transfer of title 20 |
---|
44 | 44 | | of the property. The remaining amount of sales tax due 21 |
---|
45 | 45 | | shall be remitted to the county collector five years after 22 |
---|
46 | 46 | | the date of the transfer of title of the property and which 23 |
---|
47 | 47 | | shall be paid in equal annual installments; 24 |
---|
48 | 48 | | (3) The taxpayer shall remit ten percent of the sales 25 |
---|
49 | 49 | | tax due to the county collector upon the transfe r of title 26 |
---|
50 | 50 | | of the property. The remaining amount of sales tax due 27 |
---|
51 | 51 | | shall be remitted to the county collector ten years after 28 |
---|
52 | 52 | | the date of the transfer of title of the property and which 29 |
---|
53 | 53 | | shall be paid in equal annual installments; or 30 |
---|
54 | 54 | | (4) The taxpayer shall remit ten percent of the sales 31 |
---|
55 | 55 | | tax due to the county collector upon the transfer of title 32 |
---|
56 | 56 | | of the property. The remaining amount of sales tax due 33 |
---|
57 | 57 | | shall be remitted to the county collector fifteen years 34 |
---|
58 | 58 | | after the date of the transfer of title o f the property and 35 |
---|
59 | 59 | | which shall be paid in equal annual installments. 36 |
---|
60 | 60 | | Financial institutions that are mortgage servicers shall pay 37 |
---|
61 | 61 | | sales tax obligations which they service from escrow 38 |
---|
62 | 62 | | accounts in one payment by the required due date. 39 SJR 7 3 |
---|
63 | 63 | | 3. In lieu of an ad valorem tax on property in class 40 |
---|
64 | 64 | | 1, beginning January 1, 2027, a county shall impose a tax on 41 |
---|
65 | 65 | | property in class 1 that was purchased prior to January 1, 42 |
---|
66 | 66 | | 2027, by the taxpayer owning such property as of January 1, 43 |
---|
67 | 67 | | 2027, in an amount equal to the t otal combined rate of sales 44 |
---|
68 | 68 | | taxes in effect at the location of the property, including 45 |
---|
69 | 69 | | the state sales tax rate, multiplied by the remaining 46 |
---|
70 | 70 | | mortgage balance on such property as of January 1, 2027, 47 |
---|
71 | 71 | | provided that all revenue generated by such tax shall be 48 |
---|
72 | 72 | | collected and distributed by the county in the same manner 49 |
---|
73 | 73 | | as the ad valorem property tax levied prior to January 1, 50 |
---|
74 | 74 | | 2027. A taxpayer shall select one of the following methods 51 |
---|
75 | 75 | | to remit the tax imposed by this subsection: 52 |
---|
76 | 76 | | (1) The taxpayer shall remit all tax due to the county 53 |
---|
77 | 77 | | collector no later than December 31, 2027; 54 |
---|
78 | 78 | | (2) The taxpayer shall remit all tax due to the county 55 |
---|
79 | 79 | | collector no later than December 31, 2032, which shall be 56 |
---|
80 | 80 | | paid in equal annual installments; 57 |
---|
81 | 81 | | (3) The taxpayer shall remit all tax due to the county 58 |
---|
82 | 82 | | collector no later than December 31, 2037, which shall be 59 |
---|
83 | 83 | | paid in equal annual installments; or 60 |
---|
84 | 84 | | (4) The taxpayer shall remit all tax due to the county 61 |
---|
85 | 85 | | collector no later than December 31, 2042, which shall be 62 |
---|
86 | 86 | | paid in equal annual installments. 63 |
---|
87 | 87 | | Financial institutions that are mortgage servicers shall pay 64 |
---|
88 | 88 | | such tax obligations which they service from escrow accounts 65 |
---|
89 | 89 | | in one payment by the required due date. 66 |
---|
90 | 90 | | Section 26. In order to prohibit a n increase in the 1 |
---|
91 | 91 | | tax burden on the citizens of Missouri, state and local 2 |
---|
92 | 92 | | sales and use taxes (or any similar transaction -based tax) 3 |
---|
93 | 93 | | shall not be expanded to impose taxes on any service or 4 SJR 7 4 |
---|
94 | 94 | | transaction that was not subject to sales, use or similar 5 |
---|
95 | 95 | | transaction-based tax on January 1, 2015 , except for 6 |
---|
96 | 96 | | purchases of real property taxed pursuant to section 4(e) of 7 |
---|
97 | 97 | | this article. 8 |
---|
98 | 98 | | |
---|