Missouri 2025 Regular Session

Missouri Senate Bill SJR7 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/05/2024

                             
FIRST REGULAR SESSION 
SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION NO. 7 
103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY  
INTRODUCED BY SENATOR BRATTIN. 
1416S.01I 	KRISTINA MARTIN, Secretary  
JOINT RESOLUTION 
Submitting to the qualified voters of Missouri, an amendment repealing section 26 of article X of 
the Constitution of Missouri, and adopting two new sections in lieu thereof relating to 
the taxation of real property. 
 
Be it resolved by the Senate, the House of Representatives concurring therein: 
     That at the next general election to be held in the 1 
state of Missouri, on Tuesday next following the first Monday 2 
in November, 2026, or at a special election to be called by 3 
the governor for that purpose, there is hereby submitted to 4 
the qualified voters of this state, for adoption or 5 
rejection, the following amendment to article X of the 6 
Constitution of the state of Missouri:7 
     Section A. Section 26, article X, Consti	tution of 1 
Missouri, is repealed and two new sections adopted in lieu 2 
thereof, to be known as sections 4(e) and 26, to read as 3 
follows:4 
     Section 4(e).  1.  Notwithstanding any provision of 1 
this article to the contrary, for all years beginning on or 2 
after January 1, 2027, no county or political subdivision 3 
shall be authorized to levy or collect a tax on property in 4 
class 1. 5 
     2.  In lieu of an ad valorem tax on property in class 6 
1, beginning January 1, 2027, a county shall impose a sales 7 
tax on the sale of property in class 1 at a rate equal to 8 
the total combined rate of sales taxes in effect at the 9   SJR 7 	2 
location of the property, including the state sales tax 10 
rate, provided that all revenue generated by such tax shall 11 
be collected and distributed by the county in the same 12 
manner as the ad valorem property tax levied prior to 13 
January 1, 2027.  A taxpayer shall select one of the 14 
following methods to remit the tax imposed by this 15 
subsection: 16 
     (1)  The taxpayer shall remit all tax due to the co unty  17 
collector upon the transfer of title of the property; 18 
     (2)  The taxpayer shall remit ten percent of the sales 19 
tax due to the county collector upon the transfer of title 20 
of the property.  The remaining amount of sales tax due 21 
shall be remitted to the county collector five years after 22 
the date of the transfer of title of the property and which 23 
shall be paid in equal annual installments; 24 
     (3)  The taxpayer shall remit ten percent of the sales 25 
tax due to the county collector upon the transfe r of title  26 
of the property.  The remaining amount of sales tax due 27 
shall be remitted to the county collector ten years after 28 
the date of the transfer of title of the property and which 29 
shall be paid in equal annual installments; or 30 
     (4)  The taxpayer shall remit ten percent of the sales 31 
tax due to the county collector upon the transfer of title 32 
of the property.  The remaining amount of sales tax due 33 
shall be remitted to the county collector fifteen years 34 
after the date of the transfer of title o f the property and 35 
which shall be paid in equal annual installments. 36 
Financial institutions that are mortgage servicers shall pay  37 
sales tax obligations which they service from escrow  38 
accounts in one payment by the required due date. 39   SJR 7 	3 
     3.  In lieu of an ad valorem tax on property in class 40 
1, beginning January 1, 2027, a county shall impose a tax on 41 
property in class 1 that was purchased prior to January 1, 42 
2027, by the taxpayer owning such property as of January 1, 43 
2027, in an amount equal to the t otal combined rate of sales 44 
taxes in effect at the location of the property, including 45 
the state sales tax rate, multiplied by the remaining 46 
mortgage balance on such property as of January 1, 2027, 47 
provided that all revenue generated by such tax shall be  48 
collected and distributed by the county in the same manner 49 
as the ad valorem property tax levied prior to January 1, 50 
2027.  A taxpayer shall select one of the following methods 51 
to remit the tax imposed by this subsection: 52 
     (1)  The taxpayer shall remit all tax due to the county 53 
collector no later than December 31, 2027; 54 
     (2)  The taxpayer shall remit all tax due to the county 55 
collector no later than December 31, 2032, which shall be 56 
paid in equal annual installments; 57 
     (3)  The taxpayer shall remit all tax due to the county 58 
collector no later than December 31, 2037, which shall be 59 
paid in equal annual installments; or 60 
     (4)  The taxpayer shall remit all tax due to the county 61 
collector no later than December 31, 2042, which shall be  62 
paid in equal annual installments. 63 
Financial institutions that are mortgage servicers shall pay  64 
such tax obligations which they service from escrow accounts  65 
in one payment by the required due date. 66 
     Section 26.  In order to prohibit a n increase in the  1 
tax burden on the citizens of Missouri, state and local 2 
sales and use taxes (or any similar transaction -based tax)  3 
shall not be expanded to impose taxes on any service or 4   SJR 7 	4 
transaction that was not subject to sales, use or similar 5 
transaction-based tax on January 1, 2015 , except for  6 
purchases of real property taxed pursuant to section 4(e) of 7 
this article. 8 
