House | 04/09/2025 | (H) Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | (H) 3rd Reading Failed | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Local Government | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Local Government | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Local Government | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | (H) First Reading | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | (H) Introduced | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | (LC) Draft Delivered to Requester | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | (LC) Draft Ready for Delivery | ||
House | 03/23/2025 | (LC) Draft in Assembly | ||
House | 03/23/2025 | (LC) Draft in Final Drafter Review | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | (LC) Draft in Input/Proofing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | (LC) Draft in Edit | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | (LC) Draft in Legal Review | ||
House | 11/11/2024 | (LC) Drafter Assigned |