House | 04/28/2025 | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Business and Labor | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | (H) First Reading | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor | ||
House | 04/18/2025 | (H) Introduced | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | (LC) Draft Delivered to Requester | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | (LC) Draft Ready for Delivery | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | (LC) Draft in Assembly | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | (LC) Draft in Final Drafter Review | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | (LC) Draft in Input/Proofing | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | (LC) Draft in Edit | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | (LC) Draft in Legal Review | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | (LC) Drafter Assigned |