Senate | 05/15/2025 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/15/2025 | Regular Message Received From House | ||
House | 05/15/2025 | Regular Message Sent To Senate | ||
Senate | 05/15/2025 | Passed 1st Reading | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Ordered Engrossed | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Passed 3rd Reading | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Passed 2nd Reading | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Amend Adopted A1 | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Withdrawn From Cal | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Placed On Cal For 05/14/2025 | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Reptd Fav | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Ref to the Com on Election Law, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Filed |