House | 03/17/2025 | Serial Referral To Finance Added | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Serial Referral To State and Local Government Stricken | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Serial Referral To State and Local Government Added | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Serial Referral To Insurance Added | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 3, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Withdrawn From Com | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Passed 1st Reading | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Filed |