House | 05/01/2025 | Regular Message Received From Senate | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Regular Message Sent To House | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed 3rd Reading | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Reptd Fav | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Re-ref Com On Agriculture, Energy, and Environment | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Com Substitute Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Re-ref to Regulatory Reform. If fav, re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Withdrawn From Com | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Passed 1st Reading | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Filed |