House | 05/08/2025 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Passed 1st Reading | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Special Message Received From Senate | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Special Message Sent To House | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Passed 3rd Reading | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Passed 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Reptd Fav | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Com Substitute Adopted | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Withdrawn From Com | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Filed |