Senate | 04/11/2025 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 24 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Received from House | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 7 | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Committee Hearing 09:00 |