Senate | 04/01/2025 | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/31 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Signed by Governor 03/27 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Signed by President | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Signed by Speaker | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Returned to Senate | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Second reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 9 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 11 0 2 | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Committee Hearing 02:45 | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | Committee Hearing 09:45 |