Legislature
|
04/14/2025
|
Approved by Governor on April 14, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/10/2025
|
Presented to Governor on April 10, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/10/2025
|
President/Speaker signed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/10/2025
|
Passed on Final Reading 33-13-3
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/10/2025
|
Dispensing of reading at large approved
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/10/2025
|
Raybould FA92 not considered
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/10/2025
|
Motion to return to Select File withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/10/2025
|
Raybould FA92 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/08/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ST15 recorded
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/08/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ST15 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/08/2025
|
Placed on Final Reading with ST15
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/31/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/31/2025
|
Holdcroft AM851 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/31/2025
|
Holdcroft AM851 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/31/2025
|
Dover AM843 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/31/2025
|
Clements AM624 lost
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/31/2025
|
Holdcroft AM682 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/31/2025
|
Raybould AM625 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/31/2025
|
Raybould AM811 lost
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/31/2025
|
Raybould AM626 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/31/2025
|
Raybould MO143 failed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/31/2025
|
Raybould MO143 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/28/2025
|
Dover AM843 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/27/2025
|
Clements AM624 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/27/2025
|
Raybould AM811 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/26/2025
|
Holdcroft AM682 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/25/2025
|
Raybould AM625 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/25/2025
|
Raybould AM626 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/13/2025
|
Attorney General Opinion 25-001 to Raybould
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/10/2025
|
Placed on Select File
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/04/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/04/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO60 prevailed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/04/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO60 Reconsider the vote taken on FA27 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/04/2025
|
Raybould FA27 lost
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/04/2025
|
Raybould FA27 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/04/2025
|
General Affairs AM232 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/03/2025
|
General Affairs AM232 pending
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/12/2025
|
General Affairs AM232 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/12/2025
|
Placed on General File with AM232
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/24/2025
|
Notice of hearing for February 03, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/14/2025
|
Referred to General Affairs Committee
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/10/2025
|
Date of introduction
|
|
|