Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB113 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 7, 2025
Fiscal Note January 31, 2025
Fiscal Note January 31, 2025
Bill January 10, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 8, 2025

Chaptered

Bill April 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis February 11, 2025
Analysis January 24, 2025