Legislature | 05/01/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 05/01/2025 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM247 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/17/2025 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM247 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/17/2025 | Placed on General File with AM247 | ||
Legislature | 02/13/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/14/2025 | Raybould name added | ||
Legislature | 01/14/2025 | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/10/2025 | Date of introduction |