Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB120 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 24, 2025
Bill January 10, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 14, 2025
Analysis February 20, 2025