Legislature
|
04/10/2025
|
Approved by Governor on April 9, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/03/2025
|
Presented to Governor on April 3, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/03/2025
|
President/Speaker signed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/03/2025
|
Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-5-2
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/26/2025
|
Placed on Final Reading
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/19/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/19/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO58 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/19/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO57 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/12/2025
|
Hardin priority bill
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/11/2025
|
Placed on Select File
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/05/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/05/2025
|
Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM225 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/05/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO59 failed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/03/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO59 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/03/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO58 Bracket until May 1, 2025 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/03/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO57 Recommit to the Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/12/2025
|
Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM225 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/12/2025
|
Placed on General File with AM225
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/27/2025
|
Notice of hearing for February 04, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/15/2025
|
Brandt name added
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/15/2025
|
Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/14/2025
|
Fredrickson name added
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/14/2025
|
Conrad name added
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/13/2025
|
Date of introduction
|
|
|