LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Nebraska NE
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Legislature
Bills
LB168
Draft Versions
NE
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB168
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session
Nebraska Legislature Bill LB168
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
March 6, 2025
Fiscal Note
February 3, 2025
Bill
January 13, 2025
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 26, 2025
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 26, 2025
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
April 10, 2025
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
February 11, 2025
Analysis
January 27, 2025