Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB209 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 22, 2025
Bill January 14, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 13, 2025

Enrolled

Bill February 13, 2025

Chaptered

Bill February 26, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis January 24, 2025
Analysis January 23, 2025
Analysis January 23, 2025