Legislature
|
04/25/2025
|
Presented to Governor on April 25, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/25/2025
|
President/Speaker signed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/25/2025
|
Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-7-4
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/25/2025
|
Dispensing of reading at large approved
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/14/2025
|
Placed on Final Reading
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/09/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/09/2025
|
DeKay AM759 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/09/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ER28 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/25/2025
|
DeKay AM759 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/25/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ER28 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/25/2025
|
Placed on Select File with ER28
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/14/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/14/2025
|
Agriculture AM501 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/14/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO66 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/14/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO71 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/14/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO72 failed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/13/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO71 Recommit to the Agriculture Committee filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/13/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO66 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/13/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO72 pending
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/13/2025
|
Cavanaugh, M. MO72 Bracket until March 19, 2025 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/13/2025
|
Agriculture AM501 pending
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/10/2025
|
Agriculture AM501 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/10/2025
|
Placed on General File with AM501
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/10/2025
|
Agriculture priority bill
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/24/2025
|
Notice of hearing for February 04, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/16/2025
|
Referred to Agriculture Committee
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/14/2025
|
Date of introduction
|
|
|