Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB245 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 18, 2025
Fiscal Note February 3, 2025
Bill January 14, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 10, 2025
Analysis January 28, 2025