Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB245 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/18/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Clinton Verner 
LB 245 DATE PREPARED: March 18, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0056 
    
Revision: 01  
  FISCAL NOTE 
Revised for AM501 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS  See below  See below 
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS  See below  See below 
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political s ubdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB245 with AM501 would do the following: 
 
- Updates the Food Code for the 2022 Recommendations of the United States Public Health Service, Food and Drug 
Administration, conforms state code with Federal code; 
- Amends definitions to Food Establishment and pharmacy under the Pure Food Act	; 
- Updates the references to the federal Current Good Manufacturing P	ractice to conform with current federal code; 
- Creates a temperature requirement for Food Establishments under the Pure Food Act; 
- Updates fees under the Pure 	Food Act and Weights and Measures Act; 
- Creates exemptions to the fees under the Pure Food Act; 
- Updates the reference guidance for the Weights and Measures Act; and 
- Declares an emergency. 
 
Amendments to the fee schedules are as follows: 
 
Statutory Maximum as amended by AM501
Permit Type
Initial Permit 
Fee
Base Annual 
Fee
Secondary or 
Additional 
Food 
Preparation 
Area Annual 
Fee
Secondary 
Unity or 
Units 
Annual Fee
Initial Permit 
Fee
Base Annual 
Fee
Secondary or 
Additional 
Food 
Preparation 
Area Annual 
Fee
Secondary 
Unity or Units 
Annual Fee
Limited Retail Food Establishment86.19$             	86.19$           	43.09$             N/A 122.00$            	122.00$        	61.00$            N/A
Itinerant Food Vendor	86.19$             	86.19$           	43.09$             N/A 122.00$            	122.00$        	61.00$            N/A
Limited Food Service Establishment86.19$             	86.19$           	43.09$             N/A 122.00$            	122.00$        	61.00$            N/A
Mobile Food Unit	86.19$             n/a n/a 43.09$          	122.00$            N/A N/A	61$                     
Pushcart	86.19$             N/A N/A 17.23$          	122.00$            N/A N/A	24$                     
Vending Machine	86.19$             	122.00$            
One to ten units	N/A N/A 17.23$          	N/A N/A	24$                     
Eleven to twenty units	N/A N/A 34.46$          	N/A N/A	49$                     
Twenty-one to thirty unitys	N/A N/A 51.69$          	N/A N/A	73$                     
Thirty-one to forty units	N/A N/A 86.15$          	N/A N/A	98$                     
Over forty units	N/A N/A 86.15$          	N/A N/A	122$                  
Food Processing Plant	86.19$             	120.64$         	43.09$             N/A 122.00$            	171.00$        	61.00$            N/A
Salvage Operation	86.19$             	120.64$         	43.00$             	122.00$            	171.00$        	61.00$            N/A
Commissary	86.19$             	120.64$         	43.00$             N/A 122.00$            	171.00$        	61.00$            N/A
All Other Food Establishment 86.19$             	120.64$         	43.09$             N/A 122.00$            	171.00$        	61.00$            N/A
Existing Statutory Maximum
Pure Food Act Fees
 
 
CONTINUED ON PAGE 2 
  LB 245_01 
PAGE 2 
 
 
 
 
 
Min Max Min Max
Scales
Up through 35 pounds capacity	7.96$      14.34$    15.00$    20.00$    
Multiunit Scales	51.00$    80.37$    84.00$    114.00$  
Over 35 through 1,000 pounds capacity 15.13$    25.35$    27.00$    36.00$    
Over 1,000 through 4,000 pounds capacity31.87$    51.03$    54.00$    72.00$    
Over 4,000 through 50,000 pounds capacity36.65$    58.36$    61.00$    83.00$    
Over 50,000 through 150,000 pounds capacity39.04$    62.03$    65.00$    88.00$    
Over 150,000 pounds capacity	86.87$    135.40$  142.00$  192.00$  
Length Measuring Devices:
Cordage or fabric	16.56$    27.55$    29.00$    40.00$    
Pumps
Service Station Dispensers—per measuring 
element	5.09$      9.94$      10.00$    14.00$    
High-capacity service station dispensers over 
20 gallons per minute—per dispensing 
element	17.52$    29.02$    30.00$    41.00$    
Compressed natural gas—per dispensing 
element	91.65$    142.74$  150.00$  202.00$  
Meters
Vehicle tank meters	14.17$    23.88$    25.00$    34.00$    
Loading rack meters	31.87$    51.03$    54.00$    72.00$    
Liquid petroleum gas meters	40.00$    63.50$    67.00$    90.00$    
Liquid fertilizer and herbicide meters 36.65$    58.36$    61.00$    83.00$    
Liquid feed meters	36.65$    58.36$    61.00$    83.00$    
Cryogenic	53.39$    84.04$    88.00$    119.00$  
Mass Flow Metering Systems: 
Mass flow meters (all liquid) 78.26$    122.19$  128.00$  173.00$  
Current fee 
structure
Weights and Measures Fees
AM501
 
 
Regarding cash fund re venue increase resulting from amendments to the Pure Food Act, it woul	d be dependent upon actions taken by 
the Director of the Department of Agriculture. Regarding the amendments to the 	Weights and Measures Act, the minimal increase 
(assuming the new levy is set at the new minimum under AM501) would be approximately $55,000 - $60,000 in additional revenue per 
fiscal year, however the actual revenue would subject to the new levy set by the Director of Agriculture within the parameters of the act. 
 
 	ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RE SPONSE   
LB: 245                 AM: 501                    AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Department of Agriculture 
   
REVIEWED BY:  	Joe Massey                     DATE: 3/18/2025                                          	PHONE: (402) 471-4181 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Nebraska Department of Agriculture assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 245 AM 501.    
    
 
Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 245 AM510  	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Department of Agriculture 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Ashley Dempsey Date Prepared: 
(4)
 3/13/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-429-2487 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
LB245 as amended increases the ceiling for annual permit and inspection fees set by the Director each year 
on or before July 1 for the Food Program, and the Weights and Measures Program. The current statutory 
ceilings were last increased in 2012 and 2003 respectively. Pursuant to the statutory formula, the fees have 
been at the maximum since July 1, 2023. The existing statutory fees were established so that both programs 
were funded by approximately a 50/50 General Fund match with the fee revenues. The ceiling increases will 
allow fees to maintain that 50/50 funding mix for FY2025-26 and subsequent fiscal years. 
  
No fiscal impact as a direct result of LB245 as amended. Any additional appropriation needed due to increased 
fees would be included in a mid-biennium adjustment or in the next biennium budget request. 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL…………………………… ….....