Legislature | 04/30/2025 | Enrollment and Review ST28 recorded | ||
Legislature | 04/30/2025 | Enrollment and Review ST28 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/30/2025 | Placed on Final Reading Second with ST28 | ||
Legislature | 04/25/2025 | DeKay MO199 prevailed | ||
Legislature | 04/24/2025 | DeKay MO199 Recommit to Enrollment and Review to correct an error and for reengrossment filed | ||
Legislature | 04/23/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 04/22/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 04/22/2025 | Conrad AM882 lost | ||
Legislature | 04/17/2025 | Conrad AM882 pending | ||
Legislature | 04/17/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER38 adopted | ||
Legislature | 04/08/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER38 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Conrad AM882 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/31/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 03/31/2025 | Agriculture AM226 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/17/2025 | Agriculture AM226 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/17/2025 | Placed on General File with AM226 | ||
Legislature | 03/14/2025 | Agriculture priority bill | ||
Legislature | 02/03/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/16/2025 | Referred to Agriculture Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/15/2025 | Brandt name added | ||
Legislature | 01/14/2025 | Date of introduction |