Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB246 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 14, 2025
Bill January 14, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 14, 2025
Analysis February 13, 2025