Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB246 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/14/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Clinton Verner 
LB 246 DATE PREPARED: January 17, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0056 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB246 makes the following amendments to the Nebraska Pure Food Act: 
 
- Adds a definition for cultivated	-protein food product; 
- Clarifies adulteration of food 	and restrictions on its sale and production; 
- Adds cultivated- protein food to definition of adulterated food; and 
- Adds that any violation of restrictions on adulterated food sale and production would be considered a violated of deceptive 
trade practice, clarifies that such viola tion is not be constru ed to affect the liability for any action that violates the Uniform 
Deceptive Trade Practices Act. 
 
No fiscal impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 246                   AM:                      AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Department of Agriculture 
   
REVIEWED BY:  	Joe Massey                     DATE: 1/21/2025                                         PHONE: (402) 471-4181 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Nebraska Department of Agriculture’s assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 246.   
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 246               AM:                            AGENCY/POLT. SUB: : At torney General 
   
REVIEWED BY:  	Joe Massey                     DATE: 1/21/2025                                          	PHONE: (402) 471-4181 
   
COMMENTS: Attorney General’s assessment of no net fiscal impact from LB 246 appears reasonable.    
  
   0246Prohibit cultivated-protein food products under the Nebraska Pure Food
Act and provide a deceptive trade practice
__________________________________
EXPENDITURESEXPENDITURES
NUMBER OF POSITIONS
Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines.	2025
LB 
(1)
FISCAL NOTE
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name:
(2)
University of Nebraska System
Prepared by:
(3)
Anne Barnes	Date Prepared:
(4)
01/30/2025	Phone:
(5)
(402) 559-6300
ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION
FY 2025 - 26	FY 2026 - 27
EXPENDITURES REVENUE
GENERAL FUNDS
           0.00           0.00 
CASH FUNDS
           0.00           0.00 
FEDERAL FUNDS
           0.00           0.00 
OTHER FUNDS
           0.00           0.00 
TOTAL FUNDS
           0.00           0.00 
EXPENDITURES	REVENUE
           0.00           0.00 
           0.00           0.00 
           0.00           0.00 
           0.00           0.00 
           0.00           0.00 
Explanation of Estimate:
No fiscal impact.
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE
Personal Services:
POSITION TITLE
Benefits..............................................
Operating...........................................
Travel.................................................
Capital outlay....................................
Aid...................................................
Capital improvements........................
    TOTAL......................................
25 - 26
 0 
 0 
26 - 27
 0 
 0 
2025 - 26 2026 - 27  
 
Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 246 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Department of Agriculture 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Ashley Dempsey Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/17/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-429-2487 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
No fiscal impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid………………………………………	…...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....