Legislature | 04/29/2025 | Enrollment and Review ST24 recorded | ||
Legislature | 04/29/2025 | Enrollment and Review ST24 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/29/2025 | Placed on Final Reading with ST24 | ||
Legislature | 04/23/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 04/23/2025 | Hunt AM947 adopted | ||
Legislature | 04/23/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER37 adopted | ||
Legislature | 04/14/2025 | Hunt AM947 to ER37 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/08/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER37 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/08/2025 | Placed on Select File with ER37 | ||
Legislature | 03/31/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 03/31/2025 | Hansen AM866 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/31/2025 | Quick AM850 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/31/2025 | Hansen AM866 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/31/2025 | Quick AM850 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/18/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 03/12/2025 | Quick priority bill | ||
Legislature | 01/24/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/16/2025 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/14/2025 | Date of introduction |