Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB257 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 23, 2025
Fiscal Note April 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 6, 2025
Fiscal Note February 6, 2025
Bill January 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 18, 2025
Analysis January 28, 2025
Analysis January 28, 2025