Legislature | 03/26/2025 | Approved by Governor on March 25, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 03/20/2025 | Presented to Governor on March 20, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 03/20/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 03/20/2025 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 | ||
Legislature | 03/17/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 03/11/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 02/26/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 02/20/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 02/07/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 01/24/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Business and Labor Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/15/2025 | Date of introduction |