Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB297 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 31, 2025
Bill January 15, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 17, 2025

Enrolled

Bill March 17, 2025

Chaptered

Bill March 26, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis February 6, 2025
Analysis January 28, 2025